This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 10:00:17 (UTC).

BRE PROPERTIES INC VS. BEVERLY, MARCUS E

Case Summary

On 07/26/2011 BRE PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BEVERLY, MARCUS E. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL RIBONS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0918

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL RIBONS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRE PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

BEVERLY MASAYO

BEVERLY MARCUS E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN - JESSICA S. WEISMAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE PASADENA COURTHOUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM NEW11U00918 TO PAS11UK0918

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BRE PROPERTIES INC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - JUDGMENT HAS BEEN ENTERED & A WRIT ISSUED, NO TRIAL DATE IS NEEDED SUBMITTED ON 09/19/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 58.25 PER DAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # NEW529415028 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:45P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. MICHAEL RIBONS, JUDGE PRO TEM., WITH V. BERDIN-ROMA, CLERK PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING BY SHERMAN SHEW, ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT MASAYO BEVERLY FAILS TO APPEAR.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2011
  • ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES OF (BEVERLY, MARCUS E) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT HAS TEN DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THE NOTICE OF DENIAL OF WAIVER TO POST THE PROPER FEES WITH THE CLERK`S OFFICE. A REQUEST FOR HEARING ABOUT COURT FEE WAIVER ORDER HAS BEEN MAILED TO THE APPLICANT. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COMPLETED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (BEVERLY, MARCUS E) , (BEVERLY, MASAYO) . COSTS OF $ 90.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (BEVERLY, MARCUS E) , NO DEFAULT ENTERED .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (BEVERLY, MASAYO) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED. REQUEST FOR CLERK'S JUDGMENT FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2011
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BEVERLY, MARCUS E) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW529415063.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less