This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 12:13:09 (UTC).

BENSHIAN, SHERI VS. CHASE HOME FINANCE

Case Summary

On 05/28/2010 BENSHIAN, SHERI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHASE HOME FINANCE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PAMELA A. DAVIS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0971

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAMELA A. DAVIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENSHIAN SHERI

Defendants

PROFESSIONAL RECOVERY SERVICES INC.

CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/06/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 090 , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM DEPT 90 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2010
  • NOTICE OF ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT CASE #CV10 5431DMG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (BENSHIAN, SHERI) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DIV. 090 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # LAW538978001

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2010
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF (BENSHIAN, SHERI) IS GRANTED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIM HEARING ON 10/06/10 AT 01:30P M. IN DEPT. 090 , CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL FILED BY PLAINTIFF THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PARTIES STIPULATE TO CONTINUE MATTER SET FOR THIS DATE. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 09/01/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (CHASE HOME FINANCE) LLC . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (PROFESSIONAL RECOVERY SERVICES INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/30/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAW538978008. HEARING SET FOR 07/30/10 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.