This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/10/2016 at 12:13:28 (UTC).

BENNETT, PARKER VS. RW SELBY & CO., INC.

Case Summary

On 05/21/2010 BENNETT, PARKER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RW SELBY CO , INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0974

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BENNETT PARKER

WU YU-TIEN

Defendant

RW SELBY & CO. INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/06/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (RW SELBY & CO., INC.) . DAVID AJNASSIAN APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 092 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR PLAINTIFF(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (RW SELBY & CO., INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/26/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RW SELBY & CO., INC.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 07/26/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (BENNETT, PARKER) , (WU, YU-TIEN) FILED AMENDING THE DEFENDANTS NAME, AMOUNT, AND REASON ON SECTION 3A. ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2010
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ 10.00 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2010
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER AND COPY OF FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2010
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (BENNETT, PARKER) , (WU, YU-TIEN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER . HEARING SET FOR 07/26/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2010
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (BENNETT, PARKER) , (WU, YU-TIEN) .

    Read MoreRead Less