This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 08:53:28 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA VS. GATSON, TERRY L.

Case Summary

On 02/25/2009 BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GATSON, TERRY L. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pomona Courthouse North located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0576

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pomona Courthouse North

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC

Defendant

GATSON TERRY L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FULTON, FRIEDMAND & GULLACE, LLP - ANN K MERRILL

Attorney at FULTON, FRIEDMAND & GULLACE, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/09/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • STIPULATION FOR COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: 02-11-10 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CALENDAR DESK RE: CALENDARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO CORR DESK RE: RETURN MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING IS VACATED, RESPONSIVE PLEADING HAVING BEEN FILED, CASE REMAINS ON CALENDAR FOR A NON-APPERANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW ON 08/31/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO COURT JUDGMENT DESK RE: PROOF OF SERVICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; OSC/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW NOTICE, NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT, ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GATSON, TERRY L.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN POM448028030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE ANTHONY PETERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY ANTHONY PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/31/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less