This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/21/2016 at 15:40:28 (UTC).

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA, INC. VS. AUBRY, LEONARD G.

Case Summary

On 01/23/2009 BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AUBRY, LEONARD G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LOUISA LAU and LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LOUISA LAU

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA INC.

Defendant

AUBRY LEONARD G.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANN BRACKEN, LLP - ANN K. MERRILL

Attorney at MANN BRACKEN, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 09:00A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LOUISA LAU, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (BENEFICIAL CALIFORNIA, INC.) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (AUBRY, LEONARD G.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 08-06-09 IS HEREBY VACATED, MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 01/19/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM,ADR PKG,NOT. OF CASE ASSIGNMNT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AUBRY, LEONARD G.) . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM482668017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/06/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less