This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:38:42 (UTC).

BEATO, ROBERTO C. VS. PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2008 BEATO, ROBERTO C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PUBLIC MOTORS L A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are HOWARD JAFFE and ROBERT ARONOFF. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0381

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HOWARD JAFFE

ROBERT ARONOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BEATO ROBERTO C.

BEATO ANTONIO

Defendant

PUBLIC MOTORS L.A. DBA PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/18/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. HOWARD JAFFE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 0000 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) DBA (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL:ONLY PLAINTIFF MAY REQUEST DISMISSAL OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM SUBMITTED ON 05/19/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) DBA (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT ARONOFF PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/11/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . ASSUME DEFENDANT VERIFIES MILEAGE: PLAINTIFF TO RETURN CAR TO DEFENDANT FOR EXCHANGE OF ANY VEHICLE WORTH THE SAME AS SUBJECT VEHICLE ($5724.55). PLAINTIFF MAY PAY MORE IF THERE IS A MORE VALUABLE VEHICLE TO HIS LIKING BUT GETS NO REFUND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) DBA (PUBLIC MOTORS L.A.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAWPAID . HEARING SET FOR 04/16/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • SC-100, ITEM 3: ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (BEATO, ROBERTO C.) , (BEATO, ANTONIO) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985{I}, CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2008
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES FILED AND MAILED TO (BEATO, ROBERTO C.) , (BEATO, ANTONIO) PER SECTION 6103.5(D)/68511.3(D) GC FOR THE TOTAL AMOUNT DUE OF $ 96.00 .(AMOUNT INCLUDES A $21.00 ADMINISTRATIVE CHARGE). CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED. CLERK`S NOTICE OF PAYMENT DUE AFTER JUDGMENT ON WAIVED FEES ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less