This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 04:39:42 (UTC).

B&D NORTON PROPERTIES VS. ROMERO, JASON

Case Summary

On 01/25/2011 B D NORTON PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ROMERO, JASON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0110

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B&D NORTON PROPERTIES

Defendant

ROMERO JASON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MICHAEL J. SELPH

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM HP 11U00110 TO LB 11UH0110

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 110.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2011
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT. PLTF. APPEARING BY DEC. CCP 585(D). NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 04/22/11 . FOR (B&D NORTON PROPERTIES) . AGAINST (ROMERO, JASON) . PAST DUE RENT $ 950.00 . DAILY DAMAGES $ 601.54 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 185.00 . COSTS $ 240.00 . TOTAL $ 1,976.54 . AND FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES LOCATED AT 8006 ATLANTIC AVE SPACE B6, CUDAHY, CA 90201 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/15/11 , FOR (B&D NORTON PROPERTIES) , AGAINST (ROMERO, JASON) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 8006 ATLANTIC AVE SPACE B6, CUDAHY, CA 90201 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 15.38 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (ROMERO, JASON) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (ROMERO, JASON) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (ROMERO, JASON) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ .00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK510400010.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 03/11/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELPH MICHAEL J