This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 05:36:10 (UTC).

BASIC CAR RENTAL INC VS. MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN

Case Summary

On 06/09/2008 BASIC CAR RENTAL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1018

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BASIC CAR RENTAL INC

Defendant

MAYWEATHER JOSHUA GIBRAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 10/06/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/10/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 04/10/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2009
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/20/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED , 3RD REQUEST (NO SASE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 11/07/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID . 70072680000042171801

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED 2ND REQUEST, NO SASE PROVIDED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/22/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2008
  • REQUEST FOR RESET FILED , 1ST REQUEST (NO SASE PROVIDED) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURNED UNCLAIMED AS TO (MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAW518909003 . HEARING SET FOR 08/01/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MAYWEATHER, JOSHUA GIBRAN) . RECEIPT # LAW518909003 . R/N 70063450000383796557

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.