This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2016 at 10:45:32 (UTC).

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP, VS. REY-MONROY, MA MILDRED

Case Summary

On 03/15/2010 BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REY-MONROY, MA MILDRED. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LEONARD D. NASATIR, DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN and LAURA C. ELLISON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0348

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LEONARD D. NASATIR

DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN

LAURA C. ELLISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING LP FKA COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING LP.

Defendants

DEL ROSARIO EDUARDO RAZO ADDED PER 1174.25 B CCP

REY-MONROY MA MILDRED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILES, BAUER, BERGSTROM & WINTERS, LLP - RYAN W STOCKING ESQ

Attorney at MILES, BAUER, BERGSTROM & WINTERS, LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA10Z00348 TO LB 10Z00348

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 164.04 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. LASD . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2010
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS SERVICING, LP.) FOR REJECTION OF WRIT OF POSSESSION: YOUR REQUEST AS TO BOTH DEFENDANTS AND ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS, HOWEVER, THE JUDGMENT IS AS TO EDUARDO RAZO DEL ROSARIO ONLY SUBMITTED ON 07/06/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LAURA C. ELLISON PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING SPECIALLY BY CARL SHAFF II, ESQ. . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2010
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) ADDED PER 1174.25 (B) CCP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • REQUEST(S) TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) ADDED PER 1174.25 (B) CCP IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) ADDED PER 1174.25 (B) CCP . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 05/04/10 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. 008 . RECEIPT # WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF PHONE NUMBER FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (BAC HOME LOANS SERVICING, LP,) FKA (COUNTRYWIDE HOME LAONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2010
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED ON 03/29/10 BY CLAIMANT(S) (DEL ROSARIO, EDUARDO RAZO) ADDED PER 1174.25 (B) CCP PRO PE . RECEIPT # WAIVER . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.