This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2016 at 08:53:45 (UTC).

BABIKIAN, MHER BERNARD VS. BAKER, PATRICK

Case Summary

On 08/04/2009 BABIKIAN, MHER BERNARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BAKER, PATRICK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3089

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BABIKIAN MHER BERNARD AS AN INDIVIDUAL

Defendant

BAKER PATRICK AN INDIVIDUAL SUED HEREIN AS BAKER PAT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OURFALIAN & OURFALIAN - SARKIS OURFALIAN ESQ

Attorney at OURFALIAN & OURFALIAN

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - DANIEL STEIN

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNCONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 03:00P M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: NON-CALENDAR MATTER . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: PURSUANT TO NOTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT BY PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SARKIS OURFALIAN TRIAL SET FOR 9/21/10 IS ADVANCED TO THIS DATE AND VACATED. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IN RE DISMISSAL PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT IS SET FOR 10/27/10 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 5. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL IS DIRECTED TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 10/27/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: OSC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2010
  • DEFENDANT'S TRIAL BRIEF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (BAKER, PATRICK) AN INDIVIDUAL SUED HEREIN AS (BAKER, PAT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (BAKER, PAT) AS AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (BAKER, PATRICK) AN INDIVIDUAL SUED HEREIN AS (BAKER, PAT) . RECEIPT # BH490068012 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (BAKER, PATRICK) AN INDIVIDUAL SUED HEREIN AS (BAKER, PAT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (BAKER, PAT) AS AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 54.95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH053884011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 12/02/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 08/04/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL STEIN