This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 08:05:42 (UTC).

B & D NORTON PROPERTIES VS. JAUREGUI, YOLANDA

Case Summary

On 12/07/2009 B D NORTON PROPERTIES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JAUREGUI, YOLANDA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAIME R. CORRAL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1695

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JAIME R. CORRAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

B & D NORTON PROPERTIES

Defendant

JAUREGUI YOLANDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - MICHAEL J. SELPH

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM HP 09U01695 TO LB 09UH1695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION FOR MONEY JUDGMENT AND FOR POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ 103.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR EX PARTE ORDER RE: FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF ENFORCEMENT PENDING HEARING. , P & A, AND DECLARATION RE: YOLANDA JAUREGUI NOTICE FILED. MATTER SET FOR 03/15/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 . RECEIPT # GC68634E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. JAIME R. CORRAL PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF EXECUTION . APPLICATION GRANTED. THE EXECUTION IS STAYED UNTIL 3-22-10. A CERTIFIED COPY OF THIS MINUTE ORDER IS SENT THE SHERIFF. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER FORWARDED TO THE SHERIFF'S OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2010
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 11.66 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: FOR CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR MAILING OF DEFENDANT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • NOTICE OF SUBMISSION WITHOUT APPEARANCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • REQUEST TO OR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JAUREGUI, YOLANDA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • REQUEST(S) TO WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (JAUREGUI, YOLANDA) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2009
  • DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT AND P & A'S IN SUPPORT THEREOF FILED BY (JAUREGUI, YOLANDA) . MATTER NOTICED FOR HEARING ON 01/08/10 AT 08:30A M IN DEPT. 002 . RECEIPT # GC68634E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN HPK542830011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 01/21/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where B&D NORTON PROPERTIES INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SELPH MICHAEL J