This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 23:31:01 (UTC).

AZZURRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATIO VS. SEGURA, ALI

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 AZZURRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATIO filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEGURA, ALI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3973

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZZURRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CO

Defendants

SEGURA ALI

EMMA GALVEZ MARIE A.K.A. GALVEZ MARIE EMMA A.K.A. G

GOMEZ BAHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELDSOTT & LEE - ERIKA M. HSU

Attorney at FELDSOTT & LEE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 08C03973 TO CHA08CS3973

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 90.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2010
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (AZZURRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION), A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION , RECEIPT NO. SM507623066 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO (SEGURA, ALI) , (GOMEZ, BAHIA) , (EMMA, GALVEZ MARIE), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, MARIE EMMA), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, EMMA MARIE) . RE:PROOF OF SERVICE OF JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE OF REAL PRO PERTY ASSESSMENT LIEN; (DEFAULT BY COURT)/JUDGMENT FOR MONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT A RE: JUDGE TO REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/21/09 . FOR (AZZURRA HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATION), A CALIFORNIA NONPROFIT MUTUAL BENEFIT CORPORATION . AGAINST (SEGURA, ALI) , (GOMEZ, BAHIA) , (EMMA, GALVEZ MARIE), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, MARIE EMMA), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, EMMA MARIE) . PRINCIPAL $ 18931.75 . ATTORNEY FEES $ 2679.00 . INTEREST $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 572.55 . TOTAL $ 22,183.30 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WED RE: REVIEW COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2009
  • DEFAULT PACKAGE RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2008
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (SEGURA, ALI) , (GOMEZ, BAHIA) , (EMMA, GALVEZ MARIE), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, MARIE EMMA), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, EMMA MARIE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2008
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (SEGURA, ALI) , (GOMEZ, BAHIA) , (EMMA, GALVEZ MARIE), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, MARIE EMMA), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, EMMA MARIE) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (EMMA, GALVEZ MARIE), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, MARIE EMMA), A.K.A. (GALVEZ, EMMA MARIE) . COSTS OF $ 134.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (SEGURA, ALI) . COSTS OF $ 63.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (GOMEZ, BAHIA) . COSTS OF $ 63.85

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN SM507623013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA M. WHEATLEY TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/18/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WED . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.