This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 11:05:02 (UTC).

AZUSA PLAZA, LLC VS. LIAO, TRACY

Case Summary

On 04/02/2009 AZUSA PLAZA, LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against LIAO, TRACY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0306

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AZUSA PLAZA LLC

Defendant

LIAO TRACY DBA HARVEST CAFE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S. SCHONFELD A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO - DAVID S. SCHONFELD

Attorney at DAVID S. SCHONFELD A PROFESSIONAL LAW CO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 75.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT AND PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (LIAO, TRACY), DBA (HARVEST CAFE) . COSTS OF $ 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO ALL OCCUPANTS IN CARE OF THE NAMED TENANT . COSTS OF $ 55.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LIAO, TRACY), DBA (HARVEST CAFE) , ALL OCCUPANTS IN CARE OF NAMED TENANT . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 04/16/09 , FOR (AZUSA PLAZA, LLC) , AGAINST (LIAO, TRACY), DBA (HARVEST CAFE) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 10502 LOWER AZUSA RD., EL MONTE, CA 91731 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT & NOTICE RE: EXHIBITS/ DEPOSITION ISSUED. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 61.41 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. EL MONTE SHERIFFS (MYG) . RECEIPT # ELM267392020 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN ELM478900009.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.