This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/04/2016 at 10:31:17 (UTC).

AUTOMATED FINANCE CORPORATION VS. REDMAN, DAVID

Case Summary

On 10/05/2006 AUTOMATED FINANCE CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against REDMAN, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0199

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AUTOMATED FINANCE CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

REDMAN DAVID

REDMAN YESENIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BERKOWITZ - STEVEN BERKOWITZ ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN BERKOWITZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/27/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2010
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER DATED 6/28/10 RETURNED AS TO (AUTOMATED FINANCE CORPORATION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED. UNABLE TO FORWARD PER U.S. POST OFFICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED. NO APPEARANCES BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. MATTER CONTINUED TO 06/28/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 . THE COURT ALSO SETS THE MATTER FOR OSC RE: WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $250.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR TODAY'S HEARING ON THE ABOVE INDICATED DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF HEARING RE: OSC WHY SANCTIONS OR A DISMISSAL OF THE ENTIRE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE ANY AND ALL PAPERS/DOCUMENTS NECESSARY TO BRING THE MATTER TO TRIAL OR TO EFFECT A FINAL DISPOSITION AS TO ALL ISSUES AND PARTIES TO THE ACTION. ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/22/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 003 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED. DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO BOTH DEFENDANTS. FILE SUPPLEMENTAL DEFAULT AND REQUEST PROVE-UP DATE FROM CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED. SERVED AS TO (REDMAN, YESENIA) . COSTS OF $ 95.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2007
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (REDMAN, YESENIA) . DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT; NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION FILED. SERVED AS TO (REDMAN, DAVID) . COSTS OF $ 60.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (REDMAN, DAVID) . DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 C.C.P. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2007
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (AUTOMATED FINANCE CORPORATION) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN MAL136401004.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/07 AT 10:00A M, IN DIV/DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/05/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2006
  • CLERK`S NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT AND CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.