This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 08:00:07 (UTC).

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC. VS. LOERA, MARIA G

Case Summary

On 02/18/2009 ATLANTIC CREDIT FINANCE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LOERA, MARIA G. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0515

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.

Defendant

LOERA MARIA G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - GEORGE L. COHN

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2009
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO (ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.) RE: ORDER TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.) FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT- PLEASE BE ADVISED THE JUDGE REVIEWED THE CASE & REQUEST TO AMEND/CORRECT THE NAME OF DEFENDANT AND ORDERED THE FOLLOWING: THE ABOVE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT IS ALLOWED, SUBMITTED ON 09/08/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2009
  • ORDER RE: THE ABOVE AMENDMENT TO THE COMPLAINT ALLOWED: PLAINTIFF TO RESERVE DEFENDANT WITH AMENDED COMPLAINT SIGNED AND FILED. BY JUDGE LYNN D. OLSON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2009
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 09/03/09 IS HEREBY VACATED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 02/19/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE SENT TO (ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.) RE: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2009
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2009
  • DECLARATION AND ORDER RE: IN SUPPORT FOR CONTINUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE PROOF OF SERVICE;MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES RECEIVED. CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ATLANTIC CREDIT & FINANCE INC.) FOR REJECTION OF ENTRY OF CLERK'S JUDGMENT- PLEASE SUBMIT A NEW REQUEST FORM & THE RETURNED DOCUMENTS. THE NAME OF THE INDIVIDUAL ON THE 1033 NOTICE DOESN'T MATCH THE FILED COMPLAINT. DEFAULT ONLY & DISMISSAL AS TO THE DOES SUBMITTED ON 08/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LOERA, HARIA H) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT;CASE ASSIGNMENT;COVER SHEET ADDENDUM & STATEMENT OF LOCATION; ADR PACKAGE. FILED. SERVED AS TO (LOERA, HARIA H) . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM482668028.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/03/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.