This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/11/2021 at 06:29:17 (UTC).

ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC VS. FULKERSON, DAVID C

Case Summary

On 11/19/2009 ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FULKERSON, DAVID C. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. BROWN and RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4604

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judges

LESLIE E. BROWN

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ASSET ACCEPTANCE LLC

Defendant

FULKERSON DAVID C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S DESAI ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CURTIS O BARNES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2012
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON12/28/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALLPARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2010
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 11:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. JUDGELESLIE E. BROWN PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. COURT ORDERSCASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATIONCOURT HEARING 09/28/10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: OF AUTHORIZED AGENT IN LIEU OF LIVETESTIMONY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER/TRIAL SETTING ORDER SIGNED AND FILEDBY LESLIE E. BROWN . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON09/28/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . . NOTICE OFCOURT TRIAL MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketNOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVEPARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2010
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2010
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (ASSET ACCEPTANCE, LLC) FORREJECTION OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED,ANSWER WAS FILED ON 04/08/10, THIS MATTER IS READY TOSET...PLEASE RE-SUBMIT W/MEMO TO SET SUBMITTED ON04/15/10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketDECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2010
  • DocketANSWER FILED OF (FULKERSON, DAVID C) . RECEIPT #BH163310007 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2010
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED. SERVEDAS TO (FULKERSON, DAVID C) . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2009
  • DocketSERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OFCASE ASSIGNMENT RETURNED NOT FOUND/NO SERVICE AS TO(FULKERSON, DAVID C) FILED. COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RNBH538847041.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TODEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2009
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNEDAND FILED BY RICHARD A. STONE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONSSHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OFSERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARINGON 05/25/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 . CERTIFICATEOF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Asset Acceptance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI ESQ