This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 18:23:13 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC VS. NAFEH, FARZAD

Case Summary

On 03/26/2009 ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NAFEH, FARZAD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1276

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

NAFEH FARZAD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES HUNT AND HENRIQUES - MICHAEL S. HUNT

Attorney at LAW OFFICES HUNT AND HENRIQUES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/20/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. PLAINTIFF APPEARING LINDA RAHIMI . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. AT THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 03/23/10 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT 5 RE: OSC RE DEFAULT JUDG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (NAFEH, FARZAD) . COSTS OF $ 50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN BH053884003.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/30/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUNT MICHAEL S