Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/24/2016 at 08:50:10 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC VS. MARQUEZ, MELISSA D.

Case Summary

On 10/06/2009 ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARQUEZ, MELISSA D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LIA R. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3081

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LIA R. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

MARQUEZ MELISSA D.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC. - MARK D. WALSH

Attorney at LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2012
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL-- DISMISSAL FILED ON 9/22/10 SUBMITTED ON 02/24/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY COMM. LIA R. MARTIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 04/26/10 IS HEREBY VACATED. MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 10/01/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MARQUEZ, MELISSA D.) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP; DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: NON-MILITARY SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS;COMPLAINT;VENUE;CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM AND STATEMENT OF LOCATION;ADR PACKET;NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MARQUEZ, MELISSA D.) . COSTS OF $ 64.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM511049008.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE COMM. LIA R. MARTIN .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • DECLARATION UNDER BUSINESS AND PROFESSIONS CODE 6322.1 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • AFFIDAVIT OF VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMM. LIA R. MARTIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/26/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEGAL RECOVERY LAW OFFICES INC. - MARK D. WALSH