This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 05:19:06 (UTC).

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC VS. LAM, PHIEU

Case Summary

On 02/04/2009 ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAM, PHIEU. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0320

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

Defendant

LAM PHIEU AKA LAN PHIEU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

REESE LAW GROUP, A PROF LAW CORPORATION - HARLAN M. REESE

Attorney at REESE LAW GROUP, A PROF LAW CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2009
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (ARROW FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC) FOR REJECTION OF PLEASE BE ADVISED THE JUDGE IS REQUESTING THE FOLLOWING ON A REQUEST FOR THE ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: A DECLARATION FROM THE PLAINTIFF/SOMEONE W/PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE BESIDES THE ATTORNEY OF RECORD REGARDING THE DEBT & PLAINTIFF'S RECORDS. PLEASE SUBMITTED ON 03/20/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (LAM, PHIEU) AKA (LAN, PHIEU) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING DATE SET FOR 8-19-09 IS HEREBY VACATED, MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 02/01/10 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED /GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT,CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET & ADDENDUM,ADR PKG,NOT. OF CASE ASSIGNMNT FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAM, PHIEU) AKA (LAN, PHIEU) . COSTS OF $ 39.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN ELM236112048.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE LYNN D. OLSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • DECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY LYNN D. OLSON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/19/09 AT 09:00A M., IN DEPT. 001 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.