This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/09/2016 at 10:31:32 (UTC).

ARRON, INC. VS. AGHILI, G.B.

Case Summary

On 02/29/2008 ARRON, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AGHILI, G B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0348

  • Filing Date:

    02/29/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARRON INC.

Defendant

AGHILI G.B.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2010
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2010
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 11/17/10 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2008
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2008
  • ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER SIGNED AND FILED. THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: THE REQUEST IS DENIED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2008
  • ANSWER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY (AGHILI, G.B.) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 092 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (ARRON, INC.) PLAINTIFF HAS REQUESTED THAT THE PHYSICAL AND MAILING ADDRESS BE THE SAME. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2008
  • REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER RE: MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL FILED BY (ARRON, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2008
  • LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE RE: CHANGE OF ADRESS (ADRESS SUBMITTED ALREADY ON FILE, NO CHANGE MADE) RECEIVED FROM (ARRON, INC.) AND PLACED INTO CASE FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING. RETURNED AS TO (ARRON, INC.) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER. INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS. UNABLE TO FORWARD. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AGHILI, G.B.) FOR REJECTION OF DUPLICATE FILING OF MOTION TO VACATE RETURNED TO SENDER. THIS HAS BEEN FILED AS OF 4/15/08. CUSTOMER FILED IN PERSON. RETURNING CHECK # 298 FOR $20.00 SUBMITTED ON 04/07/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2008
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AGHILI, G.B.) FOR REJECTION OF MOTION TO VACATE REJECTED: INCOMPLETE FORM - COMPLETE DATE UNDER #4. FILING FEE OF $20.00 IS REQUIRED. SUBMITTED ON 03/26/08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (ARRON, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (ARRON, INC.) DUE TO RETURN TO SENDER. INSUFFICIENT ADDRESS. UNABLE TO FORWARD. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO JAEFFREY NABATMAMA FOR AARON INC. .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DIV. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 03/21/08 . FOR (ARRON, INC.) . AGAINST (AGHILI, G.B.) . PRINCIPAL $ 2499.00 . COSTS $ 60.00 . TOTAL $ 2559.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (AGHILI, G.B.) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/21/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAWPAID. HEARING SET FOR 03/21/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DIV. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (AGHILI, G.B.) . RECEIPT # LAWPAID . 70060810000053822507

    Read MoreRead Less