This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/06/2016 at 16:57:31 (UTC).

AMES, MARK VS. RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2011 AMES, MARK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1824

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMES MARK AN INDIVIDIUAL

Defendant

RHEA STEPHANIE CHASE AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MIHELL & ASSOCIATES - MONICA ARIEL MIHELL

Attorney at MIHELL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE SANTA MONICA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 11U01824 TO SM 11R01824

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • COURT ORDERS DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/01/11 , FOR (AMES, MARK) AN INDIVIDIUAL , AGAINST (RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE) AN INDIVIDUAL , PAST DUE RENT $ 7500.00 , DAILY DAMAGES $ 16882.25 , ATTORNEY FEES $ 0.00 , COSTS $ 617.75 . TOTAL $ 25,000.00 . RESTITUTION AND POSSESSION OF PREMISES NOT AT ISSUE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WES RE: REVIEW COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 585(D) CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AMES, MARK) AN INDIVIDIUAL FOR REJECTION OF COURT JUDGMENT REVIEWED BY JUDGE COWAN: DAMAGES EXCEED AMOUNT PERMITTED IN LIMITED CASE. EITHER CAP DAMAGES AT 25K OR FILE UNLIMITED CASE. SUBMITTED ON 10/25/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO WEE RE: REVIEW COURT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT/UD; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM, BLANK ANSWER, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM, FILED. SERVED AS TO (RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE) AN INDIVIDUAL . COSTS OF $ 107.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AMES, MARK) AN INDIVIDIUAL FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR AN ENTRY OF DEFAULT: NO PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS-COMPLAINT ON FILE SUBMITTED ON 07/12/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE) AN INDIVIDUAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2011
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING EXHIBIT TO THE COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (RHEA, STEPHANIE CHASE) AN INDIVIDUAL RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. WEG FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # SM500645007

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN SM500645033.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.