This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2016 at 14:13:27 (UTC).

AMERICAN PACIFIC COMMERCE INC. VS BANDA, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 AMERICAN PACIFIC COMMERCE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BANDA, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1989

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN PACIFIC COMMERCE INC.

Defendant

BANDA MICHAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE INGLEWOOD COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SBA08S01989 TO ING08ST1989

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR EXAM. OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. COURT ORDERS MATTER PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2008
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 8 RE: ON CALENDAR FOR 12-12-08 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED. MATTER SET ON 12/12/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2008
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION RE: SMALL CLAIMS ISSUED AS TO JUDGMENT DEBTOR (BANDA, MICHAEL) . MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 12/12/08 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 008 . RECEIPT # PAID .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/02/08 . FOR (AMERICAN PACIFIC COMMERCE INC.) . AGAINST (BANDA, MICHAEL) . PRINCIPAL $ 320.52 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 400.52 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (BANDA, MICHAEL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 , HON. DOUGLAS G. CARNAHAN, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AMERICAN PACIFIC COMMERCE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 8 RE: ON CALENDAR FOR 10-2-08 AM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (BANDA, MICHAEL) BY SUB-SERVING CHRISTY BANDA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/02/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 008 COSTS OF $ 50.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SBA510923011. HEARING SET FOR 10/02/08 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 008.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.