This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 06:04:00 (UTC).

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SER VS. RIVERA, KARINA

Case Summary

On 02/02/2009 AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIVERA, KARINA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, El Monte Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LYNN D. OLSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0207

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    El Monte Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LYNN D. OLSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES INC

Defendant

RIVERA KARINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE RETURNED AS TO (RIVERA, KARINA) DUE TO UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 , HON. LYNN D. OLSON PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2009
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING RETURNED AS TO (RIVERA, KARINA) DUE TO MOVED LEFT NO ADDRESS UNABLE TO FORWARD RETURN TO SENDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 06/08/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 05/04/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (RIVERA, KARINA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/30/09 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . COSTS OF $ 45.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELM482668010. TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 03/30/09 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less