This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2016 at 12:24:21 (UTC).

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SER VS. KERR, KRISTEN

Case Summary

On 03/03/2009 AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SER filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KERR, KRISTEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0855

  • Filing Date:

    03/03/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

Defendant

KERR KRISTEN AKA JENSEN KRISTEN KERR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - I. ROBERT STEINIGISSER

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/20/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2009
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER/TRIAL SETTING ORDER SIGNED AND FILED BY RICHARD A. STONE . MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 01/13/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SET ON 09/04/09 OFF CALENDAR) . NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • NOTICE OF COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2009
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO 006 RE: OSC 09/04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.) A DELAWARE CORPORATION .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (KERR, KRISTEN) AKA (JENSEN, KRISTEN KERR) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (KERR, KRISTEN) AKA (JENSEN, KRISTEN KERR) . RECEIPT # BH538847010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE; NOTICEOF CASE ASSIGNMENT FILED. SERVED AS TO (KERR, KRISTEN) AKA (JENSEN, KRISTEN KERR) SERVED BILL JOHNSON . COSTS OF $ 45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN BH053884002.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY RICHARD A. STONE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/04/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 006 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less