This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/17/2016 at 12:21:49 (UTC).

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE, INC. VS. MOORE, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MOORE, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SOHEILA OMRANI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2541

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SOHEILA OMRANI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCE INC.

Defendant

MOORE CYNTHIA0

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 05/06/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER CD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEQ , HON. SOHEILA OMRANI, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT(S). THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (AT THE REQUEST OF THE PLAINTIFF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM DEPT. Q .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MOORE, CYNTHIA)0 BY SUB-SERVING MARISSAL MENDOZA . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/01/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WEQ COSTS OF $ 55.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN SM505588003. HEARING SET FOR 10/01/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. WEQ.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.