This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 05:57:44 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BAN VS. NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 05/11/2009 AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BOBBI TILLMON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1861

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

NASSIRZADEH JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES - LINA M MICHAEL ESQ

Attorney at MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

MALAT, MALAT & GETZELS - GERALD A MALAT

Attorney at MALAT, MALAT & GETZELS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2010
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2010
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MEDIATION REJECTED. COURT TRIAL SET 8/16/2010 AT 1:30 P.M. IN DEPARTMENT 005. TRIAL ESTIMATE IS 3 DAYS. NOTICE IS WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2009
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 08/16/10 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. BOBBI TILLMON PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - COLLECTIONS - PROOF OF SERVICE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: ANSWER HAVING BEEN FILED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE IS DISCHARGED AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 12/17/09 AT 8:30 A.M. IN DEPARTMENT 5. CLERK TO GIVE NOTICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/17/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 11/12/09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2009
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH) . RECEIPT # BH438847029 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS & COMPLAINT; ADR PACKAGE FILED. SERVED AS TO (NASSIRZADEH, JOSEPH) SERVED 'JANE DOE' . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN BH490068014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2009
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY BOBBI TILLMON TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/12/09 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Express Centurion Bank is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL LINA M