Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/21/2016 at 16:05:30 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS OLIVEIRA, ISANIEL

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against OLIVEIRA, ISANIEL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6996

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendant

OLIVEIRA ISANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK A KIRKORSKY P C ATTYS AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/20/2013
  • CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO G C 68152 D(1) & D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2012
  • DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED: ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2012
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • NON SERVICE/RETURN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • NON SERVICE/RETURN FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2011
  • OSC SET 04/30/12, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less