This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2016 at 21:19:31 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB VS KIM, OK

Case Summary

On 09/14/2010 AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIM, OK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6470

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK FSB

Defendants

BO DO KO USA INC

KIM OK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2015
  • PROCESSED REQUEST FOR REFUND DOCUMENTS FORWARDED TO NORWALK +

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • FUNDS IN THE AMOUNT OF $25.00 REFUNDED TO BLEIER & COX, A.P.C.+

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2015
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND SIGNED BY ADMINISTRATOR II AND FILED +

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2015
  • REQUEST FOR REFUND RECEIVED +

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2015
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • ABSTRACT ISSUED: RETURNED TO ATTY SVC/KE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2011
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • MEMO COST .00 CREDIT .00 INTEREST $221.04 FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO L A CO/ATTY SVC/MC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2010
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • OSC SET 03/18/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BO DO KO USA INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB, A FEDERAL SAVINGS BANK is a litigant