Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 16:27:54 (UTC).

AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC. VS INGRAM, MARTIN INC. DBA PRIME

Case Summary

On 10/28/2011 AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INGRAM, MARTIN INC DBA PRIME. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9696

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC.

Defendant

INGRAM MARTIN INC. DBA PRIME GRIND

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/09/12 . FOR (AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC.) . AGAINST (INGRAM, MARTIN INC. DBA PRIME GRIND) . PRINCIPAL $ 1225.00 . COSTS $ 65.00 . TOTAL $ 1290.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANT'S NAME IS AMENDED BY THE COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2012
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (INGRAM, MARTIN INC. DBA PRIME GRIND) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (INGRAM, MARTIN) INC. FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 02/09/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT 090 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (AMERICAN APARTMENT CARE INC.) FILED DEFENDANT COMPANY NAME CHANGE TO: MARTIN INGRAM INC 714 W. 1ST ST LOS ANGELES CA 90012 FROM PRIME GRIND COFFE 121 S. ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2012
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 02/09/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 01/12/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 505584015 . HEARING SET FOR 12/09/11 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less