This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/29/2016 at 11:20:32 (UTC).

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES VS. WEST COVINA MOTORS, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/12/2010 A M FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WEST COVINA MOTORS, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5646

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

WEST COVINA MOTORS INC. A CORPORATION DBA CLIPPINGER CHEVROLET

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF SIEGEL & SIEGEL - BRANDI S. ROSCHKO

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF SIEGEL & SIEGEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE NORWALK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM CIT10B05646 TO NOR10CJ5646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION ATTY. SERV. , RECEIPT NO. CIT006116002 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED AS TO DOES / ROES 1-10 , [INCLUSIVE] ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (WEST COVINA MOTORS, INC.) A CORPORATION, DBA (CLIPPINGER CHEVROLET) . DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS, AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: EXHIBIT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: ATTORNEY FEES UNDER CC 1717.5 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: INTEREST CALCULATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: SEC. 1033 CCP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2011
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF FOR REJECTION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PACKAGE. REASON: ITEM #1B ON THE REQUEST DOES NOT CONFORM TO THE COMPLAINT. DEFAULT HAS NOT BEEN ENTERED. SUBMITTED ON 08/23/11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT RECEIVED AS TO (WEST COVINA MOTORS, INC.) A CORPORATION, DBA (CLIPPINGER CHEVROLET) AND FILED, NOT ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2011
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY DOUGLAS SORTINO TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 10/11/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2011
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED. SERVED AS TO (WEST COVINA MOTORS, INC.) A CORPORATION, DBA (CLIPPINGER CHEVROLET) SUBSERVED NORMA HODGES, BUSINESS MANAGER/REGISTERED AGENT . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DECLARATION RE: DILIGENCE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY COMMISSIONER ANTHONY M. PETERS TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/18/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 002 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN PAID.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West Covina Motor Group LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A & J FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roschko, Brandi S