This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2016 at 04:55:53 (UTC).

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES VS SEA AN SUN LLC

Case Summary

On 11/03/2010 A M FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SEA AN SUN LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9411

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES

Defendants

SEA AND SURF LLC

SEA AN SUN LLC

JUDRY SHAY

SUDRY SHAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SIEGEL & SIEGEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; RETURNED VIA MAIL/OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO L A CO/ATTY SVC/MC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2011
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2011
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2011
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2011
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 02/15/12 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2010
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2010
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED FOR FICTITIOUS NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2010
  • OSC SET 05/09/11, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEA AND SURF LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A & J FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant