This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/04/2016 at 20:52:02 (UTC).

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES VS. SAHBAL, BINTUG

Case Summary

On 11/30/2010 A M FINANCIAL SERVICES filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SAHBAL, BINTUG. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4732

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

SAHBAL BINTUG INDIVIDUALLY

SAHBAL AZRA INDIVIDUALLY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF SIEGEL & SIEGEL - BRANDI ROSCHKO

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SIEGEL & SIEGEL

Defendant Attorney

ATTORNEY AT LAW - GLENN E. STEVENS

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/15/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 10C04732 TO CHA10CS4732

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2012
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2012
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING AND/OR APPEALABLE ORDER DATED 1/30/12 RETURNED AS TO GLENN E. STEVENS DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED;UNABLE TO FORWARD .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2012
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WED , HON. DIANA M. WHEATLEY PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. . . SETTLEMENT REACHED. COURT TRIAL ORDERED OFF CALENDAR. MATTER SET FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING ON 04/26/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2012
  • NOTICE OF THAT CASE HAS SETTLED AND THAT THE DISMISSAL WILL BE FILED 3/15/12 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WED , HON. DIANA M. WHEATLEY PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: CASE MANAGEMENT/TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT WAIVE JURY. A 2-4 HOUR COURT TRIAL IS SET FOR 1/30/12 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT WE-D. NOTICE WAIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2011
  • MATTER SET FOR COURT TRIAL ON 01/30/12 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. WED .

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2011
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT WED RE: 6/1/11 CMR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • GENERAL DENIAL FILED OF (SAHBAL, BINTUG) INDIVIDUALLY , (SAHBAL, AZRA) INDIVIDUALLY . RECEIPT # SM322457014 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: GENERAL DENIAL FILED. SERVED AS TO (A&M FINANCIAL SERVICES) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION . COSTS OF $ 0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, ADR PACKAGE, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ ADDENDUM, DRPA (CONTRACTORS), STIP PARTICIPATE ADR FILED. SERVED AS TO (SAHBAL, BINTUG) INDIVIDUALLY BY SUB-SERVIGN BINTUG SAHBAL . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT, CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET/ADDENDUM, STIP TO PARTICIPATE ADR FILED. SERVED AS TO (SAHBAL, AZRA) INDIVIDUALLY . COSTS OF $ 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • COLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN SM507623015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING/CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SIGNED AND FILED BY DIANA M. WHEATLEY TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(E). MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 06/01/11 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. WED . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2010
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A & J FINANCIAL SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STEVENS GLENN E. ESQ.