This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2016 at 04:14:50 (UTC).

ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC VS JACKSON, BRITTNEY

Case Summary

On 08/24/2007 ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JACKSON, BRITTNEY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9407

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALPHA PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

JACKSON BRITTNEY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JOSEPH TRENK

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON, BRITTANY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2008
  • WRIT RETURNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION-FILED-AB;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2007
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2007
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • FAILURE TO APPEAR JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2007
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/19/07, 08:30 AM, DEPT 94

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2007
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2007
  • RESPONSE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2007
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2007
  • SUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less