This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/11/2016 at 06:11:34 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY VS DOMINGUEZ, CESAR

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DOMINGUEZ, CESAR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1430

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

DOMINGUEZ CESAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFCS OF TODD F HAINES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2011
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • DL-30 ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • UNSATISFIED JUDGMENT TO DMV-DL30 ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2010
  • DL-30 RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2009
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2009
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2009
  • ALL FUTURE HEARING DATES ARE NOW SET IN DEPARTMENT 77.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2009
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2009
  • OSC CONTINUED TO 08/17/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 12 RE: DEFAULT JUDGMENT * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2008
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • OSC SET 02/23/09, 0830 AM, DEPT. 12, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • COMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.