This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2016 at 22:12:47 (UTC).

ALI, LEYLA SUE VS USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2011 ALI, LEYLA SUE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2420

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALI LEYLA SUE

Defendant

USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/28/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE DOWNEY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LB 11S02420 TO DOW11SL2420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. AFSHIN EFTEKHARI-PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 12/08/11 . THE COURT ORDERS THAT THE DEFENDANT(S) DOES NOT OWE PLAINTIFF(S) ANY MONEY ON PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2011
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FPS. HEARING SET FOR 12/08/11 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 004.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USA SPECIALIZED SERVICES INC is a litigant