This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2016 at 10:29:07 (UTC).

AGUILAR, VERONICA X. VS. GOODALL, COOLIDGE

Case Summary

On 08/28/2006 AGUILAR, VERONICA X filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against GOODALL, COOLIDGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Clarita Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are J. CARMICHAEL and KEVIL W. MARTIN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0696

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

J. CARMICHAEL

KEVIL W. MARTIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AGUILAR VERONICA X.

Defendant

GOODALL COOLIDGE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2006
  • NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER CORRECTING MINUTE ORDER OF 10/16/2006 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2006
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 588 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 02:20P M, IN DIV. 004 , HON. KEVIL W. MARTIN, COMMISSIONER WITH J. CARMICHAEL, CLERK PRESIDING FOR COURT TRIAL. PLAINTIFF(S) APPEARING VERONICA X. AGUILAR, IN PRO PER . DEFENDANT(S) APPEARING COLLIDGE GOODALL, IN PRO PER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • PLAINTIFF RESTS. DEFENDANT RESTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2006
  • JUDGMENT IS RENDERED FOR THE DEFENDANT AGAINST THE PLAINTIFF ON THE COMPLAINT AS FOLLOWS: .. RENT - $0.00 .. THREE DAY NOTICE IMPROPER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 10/16/06 AT 01:45P M., IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2006
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2006
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO (AGUILAR, VERONICA X.) FOR REJECTION OF REQUEST FOR TRIAL SETTING - 1. THIS IS NOT A COUNTER REQUEST AS NO PRIOR REQUEST HAS BEEN RECEIVED. THE REQUEST BOX AND PLAINTIFF BOX SHOULD BE CHECKED. 2. #2 UNDER TRIAL PREFERENCE MUST STATE THE ADDRESS OF THE PREMISES; 3. #4 IS SUBMITTED ON 09/18/06

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (GOODALL, COOLIDGE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (GOODALL, COOLIDGE) IS GRANTED. APPLICANT(S) MAY PROCEED IN THIS ACTION WITHOUT PAYMENT OF ANY COURT FEES OR COSTS LISTED IN RULE 985(I), CALIFORNIA RULES OF COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2006
  • ANSWER FILED OF (GOODALL, COOLIDGE) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS COMPLAINT ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKAGE CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. SERVED AS TO (GOODALL, COOLIDGE) . COSTS OF $ 00.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2006
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN NEW507586034.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2006
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 11/03/06 AT 10:30A M, IN DIV. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less