This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 17:21:43 (UTC).

ADIR INTERNATIONAL VS SOLIS, OTTO RENE

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ADIR INTERNATIONAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOLIS, OTTO RENE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTY B. DREWRY and THOMAS SHAW. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9515

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY B. DREWRY

Judge

THOMAS SHAW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADIR INTERNATIONAL DBA LA CURACAO

Defendant

SOLIS OTTO RENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2008
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC244532019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2008
  • NOTICE/LETTER RE: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AS TO (SOLIS, OTTO RENE) DUE TO NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (SOLIS, OTTO RENE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ANTHONY B. DREWRY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 10/20/08 . FOR (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) . AGAINST (SOLIS, OTTO RENE) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 2580.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (SOLIS, OTTO RENE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/20/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC244532024. HEARING SET FOR 10/20/08 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE THOMAS SHAW, JUDGE PRO-TEM . .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.