This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/20/2018 at 18:41:54 (UTC).

ADIR INTERNATIONAL VS ORTEGA, RAYMUNDO

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ADIR INTERNATIONAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ORTEGA, RAYMUNDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ARTHUR LESMEZ and THOMAS SHAW. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9540

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARTHUR LESMEZ

Judge

THOMAS SHAW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADIR INTERNATIONAL DBA LA CURACAO

Defendant

ORTEGA RAYMUNDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC405190011 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2009
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC244532009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO ADIR INTERNATIONAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/29/08 . FOR (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) . AGAINST (ORTEGA, RAYMUNDO) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 2580.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ORTEGA, RAYMUNDO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 830 , HON. ARTHUR LESMEZ, JUDGE PRO TEMPORE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2008
  • PROCEEDINGS ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED. INDEX NUMBER 01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ORTEGA, RAYMUNDO) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/29/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC244532052. HEARING SET FOR 09/29/08 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE THOMAS SHAW, JUDGE PRO-TEM . .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.