This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/17/2016 at 15:28:40 (UTC).

ADIR INTERNATIONAL VS MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ADIR INTERNATIONAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are ANTY B. DREWRY and THOMAS SHAW. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9505

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANTY B. DREWRY

Judge

THOMAS SHAW

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADIR INTERNATIONAL DBA LA CURACAO

Defendant

MENDOZA ANTONIO MONTES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2014
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF TOTAL CREDIT FILED TO DATE AFTER JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 840.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • DECLARATION RE: ACCRUED INTEREST FILED, $ 869.76 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN FRANCISCO COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC487049010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2013
  • ORDER VACATING STAY OF EXECUTION SIGNED AND FILED .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • PARTIAL SATISFACTION FILED IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 840.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE STAY OF EXECUTION AND TO ISSUE WRIT FILED BY (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • REJECT SHEET SENT TO ADIR INTERNATIONAL FOR REJECTION OF VACATE STAY: PARTIAL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FOR THE AMOUNT ACKNOWLEDGED FILED= SEE ATTACHED. SUBMITTED ON 04/09/13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE STAY OF EXECUTION AND TO ISSUE WRIT FILED BY (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/31/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO VACATE STAY OF EXECUTION AND TO ISSUE WRIT FILED BY (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO KATERIN DIAZ, COLLECTOR, FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ANTHONY B. DREWRY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/25/08 . FOR (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) . AGAINST (MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 2580.00 . PAYMENTS ARE TO BE MADE AT THE RATE OF $ 80.00 PER MONTH, BEGINNING ON 10/01/08 AND ON THE 1ST DAY OF EACH MONTH UNTIL PAID IN FULL. UPON MISSED PAYMENT(S) , THEN THE ENTIRE BALANCE BECOMES DUE IMMEDIATELY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (MENDOZA, ANTONIO MONTES) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/25/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN LAC244532014. HEARING SET FOR 09/25/08 AT 08:30 AM IN DPT. 090.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE THOMAS SHAW, JUDGE PRO-TEM . .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.