This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2018 at 15:50:20 (UTC).

ADIR INTERNATIONAL VS FLORES, SILVIA

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 ADIR INTERNATIONAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FLORES, SILVIA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMAS SHAW, ANTY B. DREWRY and ROBERT HARRISON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9557

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

THOMAS SHAW

Presiding Judges

ANTY B. DREWRY

ROBERT HARRISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADIR INTERNATIONAL DBA LA CURACAO

Defendant

FLORES SILVIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (FLORES, SILVIA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 11/21/08 . FOR (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) . AGAINST (FLORES, SILVIA) . PRINCIPAL $ 344.67 . COSTS $ 60.00 . TOTAL $ 404.67 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. ROBERT HARRISON, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (ADIR INTERNATIONAL) DBA (LA CURACAO) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO MONICA ESQUIVEL, COLLECTOR, FOR PLAINTIFF .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 , HON. ANTHONY B. DREWRY, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 11/21/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . IN ROOM 541, ON THE FIFTH FLOOR, LOCATED AT 110 NORTH GRAND AVENUE, LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA 90012-3014, ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (FLORES, SILVIA) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/21/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAC244532069 . HEARING SET FOR 10/21/08 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 090

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 090 OF HONORABLE THOMAS SHAW, JUDGE PRO-TEM . .

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.