This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/23/2016 at 19:59:56 (UTC).

ADAMS, DONNY VS. MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2009 ADAMS, DONNY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MCLEAN, PATRICIA A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE E. BROWN and RICHARD A. STONE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2543

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LESLIE E. BROWN

RICHARD A. STONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ADAMS DONNY

MARKS ANN

Defendant

MCLEAN PATRICIA A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOEL ZAKUTO - JOEL L. ZAKUTO

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOEL ZAKUTO

Defendant Attorney

EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA - DANIEL STEIN

Attorney at EARLY, MASLACH & O'SHEA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/21/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO BOOKKEEPER'S OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION 06/14/10 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2010
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:00A M, IN DEPT. 006 , HON. LESLIE E. BROWN PRESIDING FOR PRE-TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONF. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY JOEL ZAKUTO . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY DONNA G. YANNOTA . SETTLEMENT REACHED. TRIAL DATE ORDERED ADVANCED AND ORDERED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2010
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ON 06/14/10 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2010
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION 05/11/2010 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2010
  • JURY FEES POSTED BY EARLY, MASLACH & VAN DUECK ON BEHALF OF (MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.) , IN THE AMOUNT OF $150.00, IN TRUST ON RECEIPT # BH490068058 .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (ADAMS, DONNY) , (MARKS, ANN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • ANSWER RECEIVED AS TO (MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • ANSWER FILED OF (MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.) . RECEIPT # BH538847025 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY (MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2009
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED AS TO (MCLEAN, PATRICIA A.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH053884031.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 006 OF HONORABLE RICHARD A. STONE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2009
  • NON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/09 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 006 . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 06/25/09

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANIEL STEIN