This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/30/2016 at 13:46:38 (UTC).

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC VS SHAKIBKHOU, JOSEPH

Case Summary

On 11/17/2006 ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SHAKIBKHOU, JOSEPH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9761

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC

Defendant

SHAKIBKHOU JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RODMAN, KENNETH BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2009
  • ** CASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE SECTIO6 151-68153 **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HELD, MINUTE ORDER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2007
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL BY COURT'S MOTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • OSC SET 10/12/07, 0830 AM, DEPT. 106, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2007
  • RIGHT TO ATTACH ORDER AFTER HEARING AND ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2007
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2007
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF APPLICATION & HEARING FOR RIGHT TO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2007
  • A/C - MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2007
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2007
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • NOTICE OF VACATE DATE AND RESET CASE MAILED TO ALL PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2006
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • MOTION FILED: APP FOR RT TO ATTACH ORDR HEARING SET FOR 1/11/07

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2006
  • A/C - MOTION FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • NON-APP CASE MGMT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 03/19/07, IN DEPT 106

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2006
  • CMR CLERK'S CERT OF SERVICE GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ABE ABRAHAMOFF DIAMOND IMPORTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RODMAN KENNETH BRIAN