This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2016 at 21:52:17 (UTC).

A TO Z TEXTILES INC VS A ONE TEXTILES INC

Case Summary

On 03/29/2006 A TO Z TEXTILES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against A ONE TEXTILES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2537

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A TO Z TEXTILES INC KAN ASHERIAN

Defendants

PARK SUNG

A ONE TEXTILES INC

PARK ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2006
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. . RECEIPT # LAC244532009 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2006
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (A ONE TEXTILES INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 092 , HON. GRACIELA FREIXES, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (A TO Z TEXTILES INC) (KAN ASHERIAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (A ONE TEXTILES INC) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2006
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 05/09/06 . FOR (A TO Z TEXTILES INC) (KAN ASHERIAN) . AGAINST (A ONE TEXTILES INC) . PRINCIPAL $ 2500.00 . COSTS $ 110.00 . TOTAL $ 2610.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT ROBERT PARK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (PARK, ROBERT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2006
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (A ONE TEXTILES INC) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 05/09/06 AT 08:30A M, IN DIV. 092 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2006
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 279625001. HEARING SET FOR 05/09/06 AT 08:30 AM IN DIV. 092.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A TO Z TEXTILES INC. is a litigant