This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/14/2016 at 06:37:52 (UTC).

A. NISSAN ENTERPRISES INC. VS. MC KEEVER, STEVE

Case Summary

On 09/24/2008 A NISSAN ENTERPRISES INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MC KEEVER, STEVE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Malibu Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DONALD CISCO and H. JAY FORD. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0167

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Malibu Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DONALD CISCO

H. JAY FORD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A. NISSAN ENTERPRISES INC. DBA SERVPRO OF SANTA MONICA

Defendants

MC KEEVER STEVE

MC KEEVER CANDACE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2012
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2012
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 02/03/12 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. H. JAY FORD, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MC KEEVER, STEVE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (MC KEEVER, CANDACE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 , HON. DONALD CISCO, PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL . THE COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS: MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL ON 12-15-08 AT 1:30 P.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • MATTER RE-SET FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 12/15/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM 003 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MC KEEVER, STEVE) . RECEIPT # MAL472300001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2008
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (MC KEEVER, STEVE) . RECEIPT # MAL472300001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (MC KEEVER, STEVE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/24/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED BY SHERIFF. SERVED AS TO (MC KEEVER, CANDACE) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/24/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 003 . COSTS OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN MAL472300003. HEARING SET FOR 11/24/08 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 003.

    Read MoreRead Less