This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/24/2018 at 05:52:57 (UTC).

A BETTER CORP. VS. HARA HUMBERD

Case Summary

On 06/24/2008 A BETTER CORP filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HARA HUMBERD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Los Angeles Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are PAMELA A. DAVIS and JOHN T. RAFFERTY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1168

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Los Angeles Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

PAMELA A. DAVIS

JOHN T. RAFFERTY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A BETTER CORP. DBA A&B PLUMB HEAT ELEC

Defendant

HARA HUMBERD AKA LAURIE ANN HUMBERD

 

Court Documents

(Los Angeles)

5/1/2018: (Los Angeles)

Unknown

4/30/2018: Unknown

Unknown

4/24/2018: Unknown

Wholly Unsatisfied

4/23/2018: Wholly Unsatisfied

Unknown

11/8/2017: Unknown

(Los Angeles)

11/14/2017: (Los Angeles)

Service of Claim - Certified Mail Receipt (Small Claims)

8/28/2008: Service of Claim - Certified Mail Receipt (Small Claims)

Minute Order

10/7/2008: Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/9/2008: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Declaration (name extension) - re: Accrued Interest ($3542.00)

10/13/2015: Declaration (name extension) - re: Accrued Interest ($3542.00)

Notice of Renewal of Judgment

10/13/2015: Notice of Renewal of Judgment

Application for and Renewal of Judgment

10/13/2015: Application for and Renewal of Judgment

2015-11-09 2015-12-09

11/12/2015: 2015-11-09 2015-12-09

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/25/2008: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/21/2011
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2011
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/21/11 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2008
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM WE-S/SANTA MONICA TO WEST LOS ANGELES COURT, VIA COUNTY MESSENGER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL TRIAL DE NOVO. APPELLANT APPEARING . RESPONDENT APPEARING. MATTER IS SET FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT`S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR HEARING RE: MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT. MOTION GRANTED. APPEAL IS DISMISSED; CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CASE SETTLES; DEFENDANT PAYS $487.50 TO PLAINTIFF, IN OPEN COURT, THIS DATE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES , HON. PAMELA A. DAVIS PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING . THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. MOTION TO VACATE SMALL CLAIMS JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. CASE SETTLES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2008
  • MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL RE: DENIAL OF THE MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT ON 12/29/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. WES . NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FROM A DENIAL ORDER TO VACATE FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • NOTICE OF SMALL CLAIMS APPEAL FILED BY (HARA HUMBERD) AKA (LAURIE ANN HUMBERD) . RECEIPT NUMBER LAWPAID . CLERK'S NOTICE OF FILING OF APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO DANIEL LEE NERNBERG FOR A BETTER CORP .

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2008
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2008
  • NOTICE OF MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND DECLARATION FILED BY (HARA HUMBERD) AKA (LAURIE ANN HUMBERD) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 10/31/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO ALL PARTIES. RECEIPT # LAWPAID

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2008
  • RECEIVED THE SUM OF $ .50 FOR PHOTOCOPIES. RECEIPT # LAW507985001 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO DANIEL NERNBERG FOR A BETTER CORP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 , HON. JOHN T. RAFFERTY PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR DEFENDANT .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2008
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 08/08/08 . FOR (A BETTER CORP.) DBA (A&B PLUMB, HEAT ELEC) . AGAINST (HARA HUMBERD) AKA (LAURIE ANN HUMBERD) . PRINCIPAL $ 407.50 . COSTS $ 80.00 . TOTAL $ 487.50 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. *****VACATED 12/29/08*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2008
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (HARA HUMBERD) AKA (LAURIE ANN HUMBERD) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 08/08/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092 . COSTS OF $ 50.00 . SERVED NAMED PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # LAW518909047 . HEARING SET FOR 08/08/08 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2008
  • CIVIL SUBPENA ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.