This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/18/2020 at 08:02:14 (UTC).

8935 BURNET AVENUE INC VS PENA, RAMIRO

Case Summary

On 12/23/2011 8935 BURNET AVENUE INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PENA, RAMIRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3481

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

8935 BURNET AVENUE INC

Defendants

PENA RAMIRO

PAIS NAHOMI M BALTODANO

PAIS NAHOMI M BALTODANO AKA BALTADANO NAHOMY M AKA PAIS NAHOMY M BALTADANO AKA PAIS NAHOMY M BALTODANO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRINKAUS, KIMBERLY K.

TRINKAUS KIMBERLY K.

Defendant Attorneys

BALTODANO NAHOMY M

BALTODANO, NAHOMY M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2012
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2012
  • DocketA/C - WRIT OF EXECUTION REASON: OTHERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION,POSSESSION OR SALE. APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION,POSSESSION OR SALE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketCLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF REJECTION-WRIT OF POSSESSION=MISSING ALL AKA AS LISTED ON NOTICE OF REJECTION-WRIT OF POSSESSION=MISSING ALL AKA AS LISTED ON COMPLAINT FILED & NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2012
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • Docket11H03481

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2012
  • DocketCourt convened on 02/06/12 at 830 AM and the following proceedings were had:

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2012
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DocketMEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S) * * REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2012
  • DocketMEMO TO SET REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2011
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2011
  • DocketA/C - COMPLAINT FILED REASON: TYPO CORRECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2011
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN, LLP - KIMBERLY K. TRINKAUS