This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/27/2016 at 10:21:53 (UTC).

8935 BURNET AVENUE INC VS ESTRADA, JOSE D

Case Summary

On 11/22/2011 8935 BURNET AVENUE INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESTRADA, JOSE D. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3201

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

8935 BURNET AVENUE INC

Defendant

ESTRADA JOSE D

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEISMAN, JESSICA S

Defendant Attorney

ESTRADA, JOSE D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2012
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2012
  • A/C - WRIT OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF EXECUTION,POSSESSION OR SALE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2011
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2011
  • NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2011
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/21/11, 08:30 AM, DEPT F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2011
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2011
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 8935 BURNETT AVENUE INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEISMAN, JESSICA S