This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2016 at 09:37:12 (UTC).

7714 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, LLC VS. MERINO, DAVID

Case Summary

On 01/08/2009 7714 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MERINO, DAVID. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Beverly Hills Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0020

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Beverly Hills Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

7714 HOLLYWOOD BLVD LLC

Defendant

MERINO DAVID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE - EDWARD L. FELMAN ESQ

Attorney at FELMAN, DAGGENHURST & EL DABE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2013
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2013
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/18/13 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2009
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # 538847049 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE RE: SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT,UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED. SERVED AS TO (MERINO, DAVID) . COSTS OF $ 60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; PREJUDGMENT CLAIM OF RIGHT TO POSSESSION FILED. SERVED AS TO (CERTIFIED MAIL) AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • REQUEST FILED AND DEFAULT ENTERED OF (MERINO, DAVID) , AND AS TO ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP, DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, DECLARATION PURSUANT TO 587 CCP , MEMO OF COSTS, IN THE SUM OF $ 195.00 , AND DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK FOR DEFAULT ENTERED AS TO (MERINO, DAVID) ANY AND ALL OCCUPANTS PURUANT TO CCP 415.46 ON 02/09/09 FILED. DECLARATION UNDER 585.5 CCP, MEMO OF COSTS IN THE SUM OF $ 195.00 , AND DECLARATON OF NON-MILITARY STATUS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 02/09/09 , FOR (7714 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, LLC) , AGAINST (MERINO, DAVID) , FOR RESTITUTION OF THE PREMISES LOCATED AT: 7714 HOLLYWOOD BLVD #3, LOS ANGELES, CA 90046 , AND POSSESSION APPLIES TO ANY AND ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IN THE PREMISES PURSUANT TO C.C.P. 415.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2009
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 42.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2009
  • ORDER GRANTING SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY POSTING AND MAILING SIGNED AND FILED. JUDGE RICHARD A. STONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • APPLICATION/DECLARATION AND ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE BY POSTING AND MAILING FOR (MERINO, DAVID) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 006 FOR CONSIDERATION. RECEIPT # BH490068030

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2009
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN BH490068011.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2009
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less