This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/17/2016 at 17:44:13 (UTC).

339 VS. DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN

Case Summary

On 08/22/2008 339 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA A. ZUZGA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3564

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2008

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA A. ZUZGA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

339 LLC

Defendants

DIAZ SALVADOR CHAVARIN

SALCIDO FRANCISCA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF LIDDLE & LIDDLE - GEORGE LEE LIDDLE JR

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF LIDDLE & LIDDLE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY WHOLLY UNSATISFIED. COSTS $ 30.00 . REMAINING AMOUNT TO SATISFY= $1.656.73

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • ORDER FILE FROM DOWNEY, MT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE FROM DOWNEY COURTHOUSE RE: REASSIGNMENT/FILE REQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED. MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 . RECEIPT # PRD . DEBTOR: SALVADOR CHAVARIN DIAZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2013
  • ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION ISSUED. MATTER TENTATIVELY SET FOR HEARING ON 01/29/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. S12 . RECEIPT # PRD . DEBTOR: FRANCISCA SALCIDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2013
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ON BEHALF OF (339) LLC SHERIFF , RECEIPT NO. DOW512201005 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/20/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM DOW08C03564 TO LB 08UD3564

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2013
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT IN THE AMOUNT OF $ 1055.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2008
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2008
  • ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION(S) FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS OF (DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN) SIGNED AND FILED. APPLICANT(S) PERMITTED TO PROCEED WITHOUT PAYMENT OF THE FOLLOWING COURT FEES AND COSTS: FILING PAPERS .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • APPLICATION FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY (DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS AS TO (DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN) RECEIVED AND FORWARDED TO DEPT. 001 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2008
  • ANSWER FILED OF (DIAZ, SALVADOR CHAVARIN) . RECEIPT # FEEWVRPEND .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2008
  • NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 001 OF HONORABLE CYNTHIA A. ZUZGA, COMMISSIONER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN DOW517299019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2008
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.