This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2016 at 21:31:24 (UTC).

18540 COLLINS LLC VS AGUILAR, JESSICA

Case Summary

On 06/02/2010 18540 COLLINS LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AGUILAR, JESSICA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3337

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

18540 COLLINS LLC

Defendants

MERCADO CARLOS

AGUILAR JESSICA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FELMAN, EDWARD L

Defendant Attorney

MERCADO, CARLOS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2010
  • A/C - COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2010
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2010
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • NON-JURY TRIAL CONCLUDED - JUDGMENT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • NON-JURY TRIAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2010
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2010
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/22/10, 08:30 AM, DEPT NWP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2010
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT/CLERK REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/29/2010
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2010
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SIGNED BY COMMISSIONER MITCHELL BLOCK++

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO POST SUMMONS SUBMITTED+

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2010
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2010
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 18540 COLLINS ST LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FELMAN EDWARD LUIS